HORSELL VILLAGE HALL CIO

Charity number: 1160600
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £35.38k £34.64k £33.92k £36.60k £22.23k
Total expenditure £35.90k £34.45k £26.17k £33.38k £22.35k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A