NORTH EAST CHILD POVERTY TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TheTrust: 1. Research the nature, causes and consequences of child poverty and disseminate findings on what works 2. Work with young people to help them to engage with and influence policy makers within and beyond the region. 3. Shape services for families in poverty to shape the provision of public services for children to better address the impacts and causes of child poverty.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
People
10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
Governance
- 07 April 2015: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jim Coulter | Chair | 04 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Karen Deen | Trustee | 10 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jackie Mchanwell | Trustee | 10 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Monaghan | Trustee | 10 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Amy Richardson | Trustee | 04 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
SIOBHAN O'NEIL | Trustee | 04 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lewis Roberts | Trustee | 04 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Philippa Gardiner | Trustee | 27 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
SATTY RAI | Trustee | 07 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
JANE STREATHER | Trustee | 07 April 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2018 | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.00k | £0 | £95.87k | £100.50k | £94.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.04k | £7.19k | £5.04k | £161.68k | £120.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 October 2023 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 13 October 2023 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 May 2022 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 May 2022 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 26 April 2021 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 26 April 2021 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 13 May 2020 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 13 May 2020 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2018 | 24 August 2019 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2018 | 24 August 2019 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 07 Apr 2015
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE CHILD POVERTY IN THE NORTH EAST OF ENGLAND FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: A) RAISING AWARENESS OF THE ISSUE OF CHILD POVERTY AMONGST THE PUBLIC, EMPLOYERS AND ORGANISATIONS PROVIDING SERVICES TO YOUNG PEOPLE B) IMPROVING KNOWLEDGE AND UNDERSTANDING OF THE CAUSES AND CONSEQUENCES OF, AND SOLUTIONS TO, CHILD POVERTY C) WORKING COLLABORATIVELY WITH PUBLIC SERVICE PROVIDERS, VOLUNTARY BODIES, EMPLOYERS AND YOUNG PEOPLE TO ADDRESS CHILD POVERTY
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/o Northern inclusion consortium
Hope street Xchange
1-3 Hind Street
Sunderland
SR1 3QD
- Phone:
- 01915661013
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window