Accounts and annual returns ETHNIC MINORITY WELSH WOMEN ACHIEVEMENT ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1163999
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 13 April 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 22 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 29 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 29 April 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2018 13 September 2019 136 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 23 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required