Financial history ETHNIC MINORITY WELSH WOMEN ACHIEVEMENT ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1163999
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £20.68k £1.71k £41.67k £14.97k £4.10k
Total expenditure £17.13k £627 £23.34k £10.31k £11.03k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A