THE ROTHERHAM BLACKBURN CLUB FOR YOUNG PEOPLE

Charity number: 505622
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £23.77k £17.41k £20.11k £4.34k £22.53k
Total expenditure £22.23k £17.52k £22.25k £10.84k £12.70k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A