Accounts and annual returns HOME GROWN HORNSEA

Charity number: 1162231
Charity reporting is up to date (55 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 13 December 2021 07 December 2022 55 days late
Accounts and TAR 13 December 2021 07 December 2022 55 days late
Annual return 13 December 2020 25 October 2021 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 13 December 2020 25 October 2021 12 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 13 December 2019 25 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 13 December 2019 25 September 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 13 December 2018 24 September 2020 347 days late
Accounts and TAR 13 December 2018 24 September 2020 347 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 13 December 2017 14 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 13 December 2017 02 June 2018 On time Download Open in new window