Financial history SCHOTTLANDER RESEARCH CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1161384
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £100.48k £100.29k £642 £721 £100.41k
Total expenditure £200.27k £270 £195.78k £300 £288
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A