Financial history RICHMOND HOUSE SCHOOL

Charity number: 505630
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £1.97m £2.20m £2.31m £2.22m £2.08m
Total expenditure £1.85m £2.00m £2.11m £2.05m £1.99m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £114.61k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £5.33k £2.48k £3.07k £3.07k £22.25k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £307.85k £207.63k
Income - Charitable activities £1.97m £2.20m £2.30m £1.99m £1.85m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £339 £961 £4.27k £4.27k £960
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £100
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.85m £2.00m £2.11m £2.05m £1.99m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £6.53k £6.55k £6.86k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0