BRISTOL GRANDPARENTS SUPPORT GROUP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Annual fund raising cream tea, annual concert.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 30 April 2015: Standard registration
- 14 September 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- BGSG (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.75k | £3.16k | £1.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.89k | £2.65k | £4.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 19 May 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 07 July 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 17 March 2017 | 137 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 10/12/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 28/04/2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY (OBJECTS) SHALL BE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS AND SUFFERING OF GRANDPARENTS WHO ARE SEPARATED FROM THEIR GRANDCHILDREN DUE TO THE BREAKDOWN OF FAMILY RELATIONSHIPS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT, EDUCATION AND INFORMATION.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window