Accounts and annual returns FREEDOM CHURCH HEREFORD
Charity number: 1161926

Charity reporting is overdue by 126 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 126 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 126 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 June 2022 | 144 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 June 2022 | 144 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 06 August 2020 | 188 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 06 August 2020 | 188 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 31 January 2019 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | 31 January 2019 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window