Financial history FREEDOM CHURCH HEREFORD

Charity number: 1161926
Charity reporting is overdue by 127 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £1.24m £1.19m £1.09m £1.24m £1.05m
Total expenditure £1.19m £1.25m £1.15m £1.19m £993.74k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.11m £922.46k £818.75k £862.35k £907.53k
Income - Other trading activities £32.13k £148.00k £139.37k £152.06k £70.61k
Income - Charitable activities £85.62k £114.89k £119.58k £125.35k £62.34k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £8.06k £508 £232 £424 £9.35k
Income - Other £1.36k £8.29k £14.68k £95.04k £4.16k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.16m £1.25m £1.14m £1.19m £993.74k
Expenditure - Raising funds £31.64k £1.30k £1.53k £657 £0
Expenditure - Governance £593.42k £33.94k £12.12k £31.43k £30.48k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £53.03k £28.94k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £7.39k £0 £0