ERDINGTON FOODBANK

Charity number: 1161641
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Other income £8.71k £5.59k £7.75k £23.68k £15.42k
Total expenditure £7.71k £5.08k £10.03k £10.22k £22.18k