PONTYPOOL CHURCHES & FRIENDS' CHRISTIAN BOOKSHOP

Charity number: 1162433
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 11 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 11 March 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 31 January 2021 92 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 31 January 2021 92 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 12 November 2019 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 12 November 2019 12 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 09 September 2019 313 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 09 September 2019 313 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 18 June 2018 230 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 20 September 2018 324 days late Download