Accounts and annual returns THE E-NUTRITION ACADEMY

Charity number: 1162043
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2021 22 July 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 30 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 24 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 21 February 2020 206 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 17 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required