Accounts and annual returns MEN'S SHEDS CARDIFF

Charity number: 1162705
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 March 2021 21 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 March 2021 21 December 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 March 2020 23 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 March 2020 23 December 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 March 2019 24 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 March 2019 24 December 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 March 2018 28 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 March 2018 28 December 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 March 2017 21 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 March 2017 21 December 2017 On time Download Open in new window