Financial history MEN'S SHEDS CARDIFF

Charity number: 1162705
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/03/2017 01/03/2018 01/03/2019 01/03/2020 01/03/2021
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A