CHAMPNESS HALL TRUST

Charity number: 1160953
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 07 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 07 October 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 17 November 2020 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019

(These accounts
have been qualified)

17 November 2020 17 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 25 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 25 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 26 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 26 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 04 December 2017 34 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 04 December 2017 34 days late Download