CHAMPNESS HALL TRUST

Charity number: 1160953
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Alison Barrow Trustee 14 October 2020 None on record
BARRY WORRALL Trustee 01 February 2016 None on record
STEPHEN TERENCE DUCKWORTH Chair 22 December 2014 None on record
Alastair Lorimar Trustee 01 September 2016 None on record
Callum Jones Trustee 11 November 2019 None on record