SILSOE COMMUNITY RECREATIONAL TRUST

Charity number: 1162018
Charity reporting is up to date (66 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £27.06k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £18.94k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A