Accounts and annual returns THE UNITED CHURCH OF ST PAUL'S BALSALL HEATH (ANGLICAN AND URC)

Charity number: 1160049
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 26 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 26 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 28 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 28 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 21 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 21 August 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 25 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 25 September 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 31 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

31 August 2017 On time Download Open in new window