Trustees FINCHLEY CHILDREN'S MUSIC GROUP

Charity number: 1160096
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Theresa Ward Chair 01 January 2016
None on record
Julian Alexander Saipe Trustee 15 May 2022
The Abraham Initiatives
Received: On time
TZEDEK
Received: On time
Spyridoula Kalodiki Trustee 06 October 2019
None on record
Polly Richards Trustee 02 October 2016
None on record
Paul Guenault Trustee 24 April 2016
None on record
Judith Iacovou Trustee 06 March 2016
None on record
Sarah Phillips Trustee 15 January 2015
None on record