TUXFORD YOUNG FARMERS' CLUB

Charity number: 505673
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 29 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 14 October 2020 106 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 16 July 2019 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 05 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 30 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required