NEWARK FOODBANK

Charity number: 1160698
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 09 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 23 November 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 28 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 28 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 02 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 02 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 05 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 05 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 24 April 2017 83 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 17 January 2017 On time Download