ASSOCIATION OF AIR AMBULANCES (CHARITY) LTD

Charity number: 1161153
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Daryl Brown Trustee 31 December 2019 None on record
Amanda Colette McLean Trustee 01 April 2020 None on record
Timothy David Howard Trustee 23 March 2020 None on record
Dr Matthew Willams Trustee 01 October 2020 None on record
Andrew David Welch Trustee 01 April 2020 None on record
Claire Suzanne Ashby Walters Trustee 01 October 2020 None on record
Heather Benjamin Trustee 01 April 2020 None on record
Anna Perry Trustee 31 December 2019 None on record
John Martin Christensen Trustee 03 December 2019 None on record