Financial history EVERY CASUALTY WORLDWIDE

Charity number: 1166974
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £10.56k £30.00k £32.50k £139.76k £144.49k
Total expenditure £11.00k £19.42k £27.66k £116.68k £127.24k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A