Accounts and annual returns ABERCREGAN UNITED

Charity number: 1161257
Charity reporting is overdue by 1672 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2022 Overdue Overdue by 211 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 Overdue Overdue by 211 days
Annual return 30 April 2021 Overdue Overdue by 576 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Overdue Overdue by 576 days
Annual return 30 April 2020 Overdue Overdue by 941 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Overdue Overdue by 941 days
Annual return 30 April 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1306 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1306 days
Annual return 30 April 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1672 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1672 days