SUNDAY ASSEMBLY

Charity number: 1162995
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 17 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 17 August 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 27 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 27 August 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 27 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 27 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 28 February 2018 120 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 28 February 2018 120 days late Download