WEST LONDON ZONE

Charity number: 1160947
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £618.74k £1.20m £1.40m £2.20m £5.10m
Total expenditure £462.97k £673.15k £1.07m £2.38m £4.11m
Income from government contracts £0 £246.02k £454.06k £232.72k £735.06k
Income from government grants £2.00k £0 £55.00k N/A £393.50k
Income - Donations and legacies £618.74k £955.00k £811.41k £1.58m £3.06m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £246.02k £591.33k £620.73k £2.03m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £2 £49 £118 £6.28k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £385.32k £628.56k £940.28k £2.17m £3.73m
Expenditure - Raising funds £77.65k £44.59k £132.05k £217.50k £379.20k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £34.23k £45.31k £69.13k £121.09k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0