THE EQ FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1161209
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2020 26 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 26 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2019 02 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 02 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2018 27 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 27 November 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2017 23 April 2018 54 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 22 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2016 19 June 2017 111 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2016 19 June 2017 111 days late Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)