Financial history THE EQ FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1161209
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020 30/04/2021
Total gross income £191.38k £50 £855.00k £438.72k £3.67m
Total expenditure £226.43k £217.77k £140.20k £364.55k £719.67k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £855.00k N/A £3.67m
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £124.12k N/A £719.67k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £0 N/A £3.60k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 N/A £623.14k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £16.08k N/A £0