Trustees HONITON COMMUNITY COMPLEX

Charity number: 1162412
Charity reporting is up to date (6 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Serena Sexton Trustee 19 July 2023
None on record
Victoria Louise Johnson Trustee 10 January 2023
None on record
Caroline Alice Nissen Trustee 10 January 2023
None on record
Stephen David Boyd Trustee 14 June 2022
None on record
Callum Dougherty Trustee 14 June 2022
None on record
Jennifer Brown Trustee 11 May 2022
None on record
Karen Jane Wilson Trustee 08 February 2022
None on record
Robert Anthony Sexton Trustee 19 March 2019
None on record