Financial history PINNER METHODIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1162556
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £121.16k £131.22k £171.41k £88.32k £86.04k
Total expenditure £106.90k £101.42k £130.54k £99.61k £96.91k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A