Financial history IN CHARLEY'S MEMORY

Charity number: 1160805
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022
Total gross income £44.22k £60.20k £70.60k £102.00k £162.00k
Total expenditure £43.90k £54.98k £76.88k £76.00k £128.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £3.47k N/A N/A N/A £10.00k