Accounts and annual returns ABERTILLERY AND DISTRICT MENCAP SOCIETY

Charity number: 505687
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 18 September 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 24 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 10 February 2021 102 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 10 February 2021 468 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 07 February 2021 830 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required