Financial history ABERTILLERY AND DISTRICT MENCAP SOCIETY

Charity number: 505687
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £7.71k £1.36k £1.29k £316 £0
Total expenditure £1.81k £2.19k £3.34k £724 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A