WATFORD AND THREE RIVERS REFUGEE PARTNERSHIP

Charity number: 1162226
Charity reporting is up to date (9 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 09 November 2020 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 09 November 2020 9 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 15 January 2020 76 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 15 January 2020 76 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 10 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

10 July 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 02 March 2018 122 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

02 March 2018 122 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 Overdue Overdue by 1789 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required