MICHELDENE WI

Charity number: 1160441
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 30 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 10 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 10 January 2020 194 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 30 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 10 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required