MICHELDENE WI

Charity number: 1160441
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £10.15k £10.37k £7.21k £9.06k £6.40k
Total expenditure £10.29k £8.99k £6.07k £7.87k £6.44k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A