THE AMBULANCE STAFF CHARITY

Charity number: 1163538
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 18 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 18 November 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 24 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 24 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2017 16 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 16 July 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2016 03 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016 03 July 2017 On time Download