THE AMBULANCE STAFF CHARITY

Charity number: 1163538
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £653.54k £498.98k £1.07m £1.08m £1.08m
Total expenditure £321.39k £369.69k £1.04m £990.27k £804.52k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £263.00k £805.02k £870.49k £407.02k
Income - Donations and legacies £2.53m N/A £942.50k £992.26k £925.44k
Income - Other trading activities £29.21k N/A £14.63k £5.54k £50.90k
Income - Charitable activities £0 N/A £3.79k £4.20k £0
Income - Endowments £1.99m N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £86.22k N/A £112.90k £81.28k £73.00k
Income - Other £5.17k N/A £0 £400 £0
Income - Legacies £0 N/A £3.38k £368 £7.56k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £51.36k N/A £743.79k £598.71k £482.72k
Expenditure - Raising funds £270.04k N/A £298.96k £391.56k £321.79k
Expenditure - Governance £11.82k N/A £40.67k £15.15k £16.20k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A £19.65k £14.44k £13.90k
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A £0 £0 £0