THE AMBULANCE STAFF CHARITY

Charity number: 1163538
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Helen Poole Trustee 10 March 2020 None on record
Edward WEISS Trustee 03 October 2017 None on record
Linda Millinchamp Trustee 22 September 2020 None on record
Anthony Arrowsmith Trustee 16 March 2019 None on record
Carl LEDBURY Trustee 25 August 2016 None on record
Anna Macarthur Trustee 22 June 2021 None on record
Gerry Brown Trustee 18 January 2017 None on record
GORDON CYRIL ENSTONE Trustee 14 September 2015 None on record
Diane Scott Trustee 14 January 2020 None on record
Rev Kevin Charles Trustee 10 March 2020 None on record