WARWICK AND KENILWORTH CHORAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 505695
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 10 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 10 May 2021 344 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2018 18 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Overdue Overdue by 845 days
Annual return 31 July 2017 02 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2016 20 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 Not Required