Accounts and annual returns THE BANKS LYON MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity number: 1160678
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 25 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 27 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 27 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 26 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 26 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 04 February 2019 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 04 February 2019 4 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 13 April 2018 72 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 17 April 2018 76 days late Download Open in new window