Financial history THE BANKS LYON MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity number: 1160678
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £97.81k £42.22k £38.06k £28.06k £17.47k
Total expenditure £63.00k £42.21k £65.18k £43.79k £134.22k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A