Financial history DEADWATER VALLEY TRUST

Charity number: 1160737
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £166.13k £118.80k £115.64k £115.64k £122.68k
Total expenditure £109.10k £102.39k £103.92k £103.92k £128.80k
Income from government contracts £80.46k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.00k £109.47k N/A N/A N/A