LOVE SUPPORT UNITE AFRICA FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1162406
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

LSU partners with organizations in Malawi to create sustainable solutions to poverty to bring about lasting change. Through connection and love, we offer support, hope and the opportunity for transformation.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £143,930
Total expenditure: £121,930

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Malawi

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 June 2015: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • LSU (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
James Colvin Chair 28 April 2016
None on record
THOMAS COOMBES Trustee 01 March 2024
None on record
Glyn Jelley Trustee 09 March 2022
None on record
Ben Kitching Trustee 10 November 2021
None on record
Sophie Houghton Trustee 31 March 2021
None on record
Gayle Berry Trustee 16 March 2020
TILINANU EDUCATION
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £224.10k £142.21k £139.71k £160.80k £143.93k
Total expenditure £153.19k £143.49k £154.67k £196.44k £121.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £1.44k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 31 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 31 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 29 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 29 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 04 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 04 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 23 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021

(These accounts
have been qualified)

23 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 28 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 28 April 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Tanrallt
Y STABLE
Ty Hen Road
Bryngwran
HOLYHEAD
Gwynedd
Phone:
07843064494
Website:

lsufoundation.co.uk