Accounts and annual returns VISION YOUTH CAFE

Charity number: 1162665
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2021 06 September 2022 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2020 18 March 2022 199 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2019 03 December 2020 94 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2018 03 January 2020 125 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2017 19 September 2018 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 Not Required