Financial history THE OXFORD SCHOOL OF THOUGHT

Charity number: 1161778
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/04/2017 01/04/2018 01/04/2019 01/04/2020 01/04/2021
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £5.00k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £167
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A