40TUDE CURING COLON CANCER

Charity number: 1160500
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
GORDON MOORE Chair 01 June 2011 None on record
Jonathan Aucamp Trustee 09 July 2018 None on record
FRASER MOORE Trustee 01 January 2014 None on record
Louise Murray Trustee 01 July 2019 None on record
Stephen James Morrison Trustee 15 November 2016 None on record