Trustees HEADWAY WEST LONDON

Charity number: 1160899
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Laura Murphy Chair 10 December 2018
None on record
Katherine Wilkinson Trustee 11 November 2021
None on record
Lucia Li Trustee 08 September 2016
None on record
ED LASSMAN Trustee 10 June 2014
None on record
MRS CATHY LEECH Trustee 13 May 2014
None on record
CLARE CAHILL Trustee 13 June 2013
None on record